Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert-Casimir Tonyui Messan Dosseh-Anyron

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lomé, Togo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1925Born
21 Dec 195126.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lomé, Togo
10 Mar 196236.4AppointedArchbishop of Lomé, Togo
10 Jun 196236.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lomé, Togo
13 Feb 199266.3ResignedArchbishop of Lomé, Togo
15 Apr 201488.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lomé, Togo

MicroData Summary for Robert-Casimir Tonyui Messan Dosseh-Anyron
Archbishop Robert-Casimir Tonyui Messan Dosseh-Anyron (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lomé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVogan

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 51.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 73
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast