Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philippe Fanoko Kossi Kpodzro

Archbishop Emeritus of Lomé, Togo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1930 Born
20 Dec 195929.7Ordained PriestPriest of Atakpamé, Togo
19 Dec 197545.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Atakpamé, Togo
19 Dec 197545.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bacanaria
10 Apr 197646.0AppointedBishop of Atakpamé, Togo
2 May 197646.0Ordained BishopBishop of Atakpamé, Togo
17 Dec 199262.7AppointedArchbishop of Lomé, Togo
8 Jun 200777.1RetiredArchbishop of Lomé, Togo

MicroData Summary for Philippe Fanoko Kossi Kpodzro
Archbishop Philippe Fanoko Kossi Kpodzro (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lomé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTamegbé

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lomé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018