Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Denis Komivi Amuzu-Dzakpah

Archbishop Emeritus of Lomé, Togo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1943 Born
22 May 197228.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lomé, Togo
8 Jun 200763.6AppointedArchbishop of Lomé, Togo
15 Aug 200763.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lomé, Togo
23 Nov 201976.1RetiredArchbishop of Lomé, Togo

MicroData Summary for Denis Komivi Amuzu-Dzakpah
Archbishop Denis Komivi Amuzu-Dzakpah (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lomé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKpogame Tahasi
Ordained BishopSaint-Joseph, College, Lomé, Archdiocese of Lomé

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lomé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,489
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 23 Nov 2019

Quantcast