Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Mensah

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Porto Novo, Benin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1924Born
21 Dec 195228.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Sep 197046.1AppointedBishop of Porto Novo, Benin
19 Dec 197046.4Ordained BishopBishop of Porto Novo, Benin
29 Jan 200075.5RetiredBishop of Porto Novo, Benin
10 Mar 201085.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Porto Novo, Benin

MicroData Summary for Vincent Mensah
Bishop Vincent Mensah (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Porto Novo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCotonou

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast