Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Lomé

Archidioecesis Lomensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Togo
  • Square Kilometers: 3,682 (1,422 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archidiocesedelome.org/
  • Mailing Address: B.P. 348, 10 Rue Marechal-Foch, Lome, Togo
  • Telephone: 21.22.72
  • Fax: 22.48.08

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Togo
12 April 1892ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Dahomey Prefecture Apostolic of Togo (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Togo
16 March 1914ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Togo Vicariate Apostolic of Togo
15 March 1923Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast}
Vicariate Apostolic of Togo
Vicariate Apostolic of Volta Inferiore (erected)
18 May 1937Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Togo Prefecture Apostolic of Sokodé (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Lomé
14 June 1938Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Togo Vicariate Apostolic of Lomé
Archdiocese of Lomé
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Lomé Archdiocese of Lomé
29 September 1964Territory LostArchdiocese of Lomé Diocese of Atakpamé (erected)
1 July 1994Territory LostArchdiocese of Lomé Diocese of Aného (erected)
1 July 1994Territory LostArchdiocese of Lomé Diocese of Kpalimé (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Lomé
1950109,003489,10422.3%339422,5953117ap1951
Archdiocese of Lomé
1969247,618780,95031.7%315366,8782612723ap1971
1980361,0341,168,00030.9%4336794,5706616126ap1981
1990525,6061,556,00033.8%84481323,98115422037ap1991
1999355,5331,197,00029.7%71361073,3229518527ap2000
2000367,0511,330,00027.6%69401093,3679219728ap2001
2001380,4051,352,00028.1%72431153,30711819528ap2002
2002392,6951,402,00028.0%77471243,16612023532ap2003
2003403,4561,435,00028.1%87491362,96613124136ap2004
2004413,9651,470,00028.2%98521502,75914826336ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014