Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Manuel Imbamba

Archbishop of Saurimo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1965 BornBoma
29 Dec 199126.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lwena, Angola
6 Oct 200843.7AppointedBishop of Dundo, Angola
14 Dec 200843.9Ordained BishopBishop of Dundo, Angola
11 Jan 200944.0InstalledBishop of Dundo, Angola
12 Apr 201146.2AppointedArchbishop of Saurimo, Angola
31 Jul 201146.5InstalledArchbishop of Saurimo, Angola

MicroData Summary for José Manuel Imbamba:
Archbishop José Manuel Imbamba (born ) Archbishop of Saurimo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Saurimo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,999
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2011
  • i: CB, 1 Aug 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015