Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Almeida Kanda (Canda)

Bishop of Ndalatando


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1959 BornCangola
6 Jul 198627.2Ordained PriestPriest of Uije, Angola
23 Jul 200546.2AppointedBishop of Ndalatando, Angola
23 Oct 200546.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ndalatando, Angola
20 Nov 200546.5InstalledBishop of Ndalatando, Angola

MicroData Summary for Almeida Kanda (Canda):
Bishop Almeida Kanda (Canda) (born ) Bishop of Ndalatando

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ndalatando.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jul 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,005

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013