Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Lubango

Archidioecesis Lubangensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Gabriel Mbilingi, C.S.Sp., Archbishop
  • Zacarias Kamwenho, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 3 February 1977
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Angola
  • Square Kilometers: 118,000 (45,577 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 231, Lubango, Angola
  • Telephone: (061)20.405
  • Fax: 30.140

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Sá da Bandeira
27 July 1955ErectedDiocese of Nova Lisboa Diocese of Sá da Bandeira (erected)
10 August 1975Territory LostDiocese of Nova Lisboa
Diocese of Sá da Bandeira
Diocese of Serpa Pinto (erected)
10 August 1975Territory LostDiocese of Nova Lisboa
Diocese of Sá da Bandeira
Diocese of Pereira de Eça (erected)
Archdiocese of Lubango
3 February 1977ElevatedDiocese of Sá da Bandeira Archdiocese of Lubango
21 March 2009Territory LostArchdiocese of Lubango Diocese of Namibe (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Sá da Bandeira
1970351,934750,00046.9%4158993,5546514114ap1971
Archdiocese of Lubango
1980172,061542,00031.7%1713305,735177532ap1981
1990698,8001,710,83240.8%1592429,1161210233ap1991
19991,305,0002,900,00045.0%23194231,0712313933ap2000
20001,271,3792,947,52843.1%28245224,4492818733ap2002
20021,350,0002,941,18345.9%40286819,8523619334ap2003
20031,497,3452,994,68850.0%46287420,2343619233ap2004
20041,521,8043,039,60850.1%47257221,1362820633ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011