Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Marcos Ribeiro da Costa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saurimo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1921BornCajikole
23 Jan 194927.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 197755.2AppointedBishop of Henrique de Carvalho, Angola
20 Mar 197755.4Ordained BishopBishop of Henrique de Carvalho, Angola
15 Jan 199775.2RetiredBishop of Saurimo, Angola
2 Sep 201088.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Saurimo, Angola

MicroData Summary for Pedro Marcos Ribeiro da Costa:
Bishop Pedro Marcos Ribeiro da Costa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saurimo

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015