Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacques Louis Léon Delaporte

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1926Born
25 Jul 195528.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 197649.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
22 Jun 197649.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Diana
9 Oct 197649.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diana
25 Mar 198053.4AppointedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
21 Nov 199973.1DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Louis Léon Delaporte
Archbishop Jacques Louis Léon Delaporte (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoye-sur-Matz
Ordained BishopNancy, Diocese of Nancy (-Toul)

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 49, Number 3,373

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 4 Sep 2020

Quantcast