Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philippe Sérvule Desranleau

Deceased

Archbishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1882Born
26 Jul 190927.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 193755.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada
13 Dec 193755.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sala
24 Feb 193855.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sala
12 Feb 194158.8SucceededBishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada
2 Mar 195168.9AppointedArchbishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada
28 May 195270.1DiedArchbishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Philippe Sérvule Desranleau
Archbishop Philippe Sérvule Desranleau (born , died ) Archbishop of Sherbrooke

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Sébastien d'Iberville

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast