Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Omer Plante

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Québec

Titular Bishop of Doberus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1867BornSaint-Michel de Bellechasse
27 May 189326.4Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
23 Jun 192760.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
23 Jun 192760.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Doberus
27 Sep 192760.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Doberus
5 Apr 194881.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Omer Plante:
Bishop Joseph-Omer Plante (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Québec

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013