Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred-Odilon Comtois

Deceased

Bishop of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1876Born
25 Sep 189822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada
26 Feb 192649.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada
26 Feb 192649.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Barca
28 Jul 192650.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barca
24 Dec 193458.8AppointedBishop of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada
26 Aug 194569.4DiedBishop of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Alfred-Odilon Comtois
Bishop Alfred-Odilon Comtois (born , died ) Bishop of Trois-Rivières

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrois-Rivières

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Jun 2018

Quantcast