Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Joseph Geay

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Laval, France

Titular Bishop of Samos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1845Born
22 May 186924.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 189651.2SelectedBishop of Laval, France
25 Jun 189651.2ConfirmedBishop of Laval, France
6 Sep 189651.4Ordained BishopBishop of Laval, France
30 Aug 190459.4ResignedBishop of Laval, France
10 Jun 190661.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Samos
14 Nov 191974.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Laval, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Joseph Geay (VIAF: 818513)
Bishop Pierre-Joseph Geay (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Laval

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Symphorien-Sur-Coise
Ordained BishopSt. Jean, Cathedral, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 580
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017