Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kidanč-Maryam Cassą

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eritrea (Ethiopian)

Titular Bishop of Thibaris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1886BornHebo
15 Aug 191529.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jul 193044.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eritrea (Ethiopian), Eritrea
4 Jul 193044.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibaris
3 Aug 193044.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibaris
1 Sep 195165.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Eritrea (Ethiopian), Eritrea

MicroData Summary for Kidanč-Maryam Cassą:
Bishop Kidanč-Maryam Cassą (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eritrea

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013