Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Cacucci

Archbishop of Bari-Bitonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1943 BornBari
29 Jun 196623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
16 Apr 198743.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bari-Bitonto, Italy
16 Apr 198743.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Medianum
13 Jun 198744.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Medianum
8 Apr 199349.9AppointedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
3 Jul 199956.1AppointedArchbishop of Bari-Bitonto, Italy
8 Sep 199956.3InstalledArchbishop of Bari-Bitonto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Cacucci:
Archbishop Francesco Cacucci (born ) Archbishop of Bari-Bitonto

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bari-Bitonto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 23 Apr 2015