Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Martella

Deceased

Bishop of Molfetta-Ruvo-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1948Born
10 Apr 197729.0Ordained PriestPriest of Otranto, Italy
13 Dec 200052.7AppointedBishop of Molfetta-Ruvo-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy
10 Mar 200153.0Ordained BishopBishop of Molfetta-Ruvo-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy
6 Jul 201567.3DiedBishop of Molfetta-Ruvo-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Martella
Bishop Luigi Martella (born , died ) Bishop of Molfetta-Ruvo-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDepressa

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,925
  • d: CB, 7 Jul 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jun 2017