Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Enrico Nicodemo

Deceased

Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1906Born
8 Jul 192822.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 194538.9AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
8 Apr 194539.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mileto, Italy
11 Nov 195246.7AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
27 Aug 197367.5DiedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

MicroData Summary for Enrico Nicodemo
Archbishop Enrico Nicodemo (born , died ) Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTortorella
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vallo della Lucaia, Diocese of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1945, Number 13
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 97, Number 8,321

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Oct 2021

Quantcast