Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vito Angiuli

Bishop of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1952 Born
23 Apr 197724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bari-Bitonto, Italy
2 Oct 201058.1AppointedBishop of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca, Italy
4 Dec 201058.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca, Italy
19 Dec 201058.3InstalledBishop of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vito Angiuli
Bishop Vito Angiuli (born ) Bishop of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSannicandro di Bari

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,869

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast