Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leonardo D’Ascenzo

Archbishop of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1961 Born
5 Jul 198624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Velletri e Segni, Italy
4 Nov 201756.1AppointedArchbishop of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth), Italy
14 Jan 201856.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth), Italy
27 Jan 201856.4InstalledArchbishop of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth), Italy

MicroData Summary for Leonardo D’Ascenzo
Archbishop Leonardo D’Ascenzo (born ) Archbishop of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValmontone, Diocese of Velletri
Ordained PriestCollegiata di Santa Maria Maggiore, Valmontone, Diocese of Velletri
Ordained BishopPalazzetto dello Sport “Spartaco Bandinelli”, Velletri, Suburbicarian See of Velletri-Segni

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2017
  • ob: CB, 9 Nov 2017
  • c2: CB, 26 Nov 2017
  • obl: CB, 10 Dec 2017
  • c34: CB, 14 Jan 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,666

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast