Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Padovano

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Conversano-Monopoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1940Born
29 Jun 196524.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
30 Sep 198242.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
30 Sep 198242.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Mazaca
24 Oct 198242.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mazaca
198443.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bitonto, Italy
30 Sep 198646.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bari-Bitonto, Italy
13 Feb 198746.3AppointedBishop of Conversano-Monopoli, Italy
5 Feb 201675.3RetiredBishop of Conversano-Monopoli, Italy
10 May 201978.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Conversano-Monopoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Padovano (VIAF: 203187981)
Bishop Domenico Padovano (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Conversano-Monopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMola di Bari
Death PlaceMola di Bari

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2016
  • d: CB, 10 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast