Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Renna

Bishop of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1966 Born
7 Sep 199125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Andria, Italy
1 Oct 201549.6AppointedBishop of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy
2 Jan 201649.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy
16 Jan 201649.9InstalledBishop of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Renna
Bishop Luigi Renna (born ) Bishop of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorato

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2015
  • c1: CB, 1 Oct 2015
  • ob/i: CB, 9 Oct 2015
  • c34: CB, 26 Dec 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,696

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 8 Nov 2017