Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Favale

Bishop of Conversano-Monopoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Feb 1960 Born
6 Jul 198525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Castellaneta, Italy
5 Feb 201655.9AppointedBishop of Conversano-Monopoli, Italy
9 Apr 201656.1Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano-Monopoli, Italy
30 Apr 201656.1InstalledBishop of Conversano-Monopoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Favale
Bishop Giuseppe Favale (born ) Bishop of Conversano-Monopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalagiano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Conversano-Monopoli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2016
  • ob/i: CB, 18 Feb 2016
  • c2: CB, 23 Mar 2016
  • c34: CB, 9 Apr 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,892

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017