Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Brondel

Deceased

Bishop of Helena, Montana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1842Born
17 Dec 186422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Nesqually, Washington, USA
26 Sep 187937.5AppointedBishop of Vancouver Island, USA
14 Dec 187937.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vancouver Island, USA
7 Apr 188341.1ResignedBishop of Vancouver Island, USA
17 Apr 188341.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Montana, USA
7 Mar 188442.0AppointedBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
3 Nov 190361.6DiedBishop of Helena, Montana, USA

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Brondel
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Brondel (born , died ) Bishop of Helena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrugge, Belgium
Ordained BishopS. Andre, Cathedral, Victoria, BC

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,027
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 300, and Page 581
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017