Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Seattle

Archidioecesis Seattlensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Nesqually
31 May 1850ErectedDiocese of Walla Walla (suppressed) Diocese of Nesqually (erected)
Diocese of Seattle
11 September 1907Name ChangedDiocese of Nesqually Diocese of Seattle
17 December 1913Territory LostDiocese of Seattle Diocese of Spokane (erected)
23 June 1951Territory LostDiocese of Seattle
Diocese of Spokane
Diocese of Yakima (erected)
Archdiocese of Seattle
23 June 1951ElevatedDiocese of Seattle Archdiocese of Seattle

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Seattle
1950183,0001,662,77011.0%1271763036032321,008113ap1951
Archdiocese of Seattle
1966292,6752,189,80013.4%2122734856033191,174118ap1967
1970334,4682,528,00013.2%2022354377652811,072125ap1971
1976340,2212,628,19012.9%17922039985224271875127ap1977
1980358,4602,825,35012.7%22123245379148267895130ap1981
1990320,8143,598,8008.9%21416337785083201673133ap1991
1999508,9004,425,10011.5%1991353341,5238633650138ap2000
2000852,3024,485,80019.0%1911163072,77676144523168ap2001
2001850,9254,587,37518.5%1841173012,82673146492168ap2002
2002861,2004,655,10018.5%1961093052,82371138488169ap2003
2003860,0004,711,70018.3%2071053122,75671134471169ap2004
2004904,0004,755,50019.0%2051083132,88898133452169ap2005
2010972,0005,202,50018.7%2141033173,066113122409144ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 28 Nov 2012