Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Egidius Jünger

Deceased

Bishop of Nesqually, Washington, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1833Born
27 Jun 186229.2Ordained PriestPriest of Nesqually, Washington, USA
6 Aug 187946.3AppointedBishop of Nesqually, Washington, USA
28 Oct 187946.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nesqually, Washington, USA
26 Dec 189562.7DiedBishop of Nesqually, Washington, USA

MicroData Summary for Egidius Jünger
Bishop Egidius Jünger (born , died ) Bishop of Nesqually

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurtscheid, Germany

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 410
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017