Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Samuel Silverio Buitrago Trujillo, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Popayán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1930BornManizales
22 Dec 195626.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
11 Oct 196838.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manizales, Colombia
11 Oct 196838.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Numidia
7 Dec 196838.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Numidia
18 Dec 197242.5AppointedBishop of Montería, Colombia
11 Oct 197646.3AppointedArchbishop of Popayán, Colombia
11 Apr 199059.8DiedArchbishop of Popayán, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Samuel Silverio Buitrago Trujillo:
Archbishop Samuel Silverio Buitrago Trujillo C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Popayán

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1991, Page 1,118

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013