Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paweł Antoni Jedzink

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

Titular Bishop of Themisonium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1851BornBraniewo
2 Aug 187423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
30 Jun 191564.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
30 Jun 191564.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Themisonium
21 Sep 191564.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Themisonium
31 Oct 191867.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Paweł Antoni Jedzink:
Bishop Paweł Antoni Jedzink (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013