Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz L÷bmann

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony)

Titular Bishop of Priene

Prefect of Mei▀en (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1856BornSchirgiswalde
15 Oct 188125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Mei▀en (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
30 Jan 191559.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony), Germany
30 Jan 191559.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Priene
30 Jan 191559.0AppointedPrefect of Mei▀en (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
25 Mar 191559.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Priene
4 Dec 192064.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony), Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz L÷bmann:
Bishop Franz L÷bmann (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony)

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1915, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 312

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013