Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Godehard Machens

Deceased

Bishop of Hildesheim


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1886BornHildesheim
19 Mar 191124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
22 Jun 193447.8AppointedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
25 Jul 193447.9Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
13 Jul 195669.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Hildesheim, Germany
14 Aug 195670.0DiedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Godehard Machens:
Archbishop Joseph Godehard Machens (born , died ) Bishop of Hildesheim

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 61
  • parc: MW, 20 Aug 2012
  • parc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013