Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Cogoni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ozieri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1894Born
7 Apr 191722.6Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 193944.5AppointedBishop of Ozieri, Italy
23 Apr 193944.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ozieri, Italy
25 Apr 197580.7RetiredBishop of Ozieri, Italy
14 Jan 198085.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Ozieri, Italy

MicroData Summary
Francesco Cogoni
Bishop Francesco Cogoni
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Ozieri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuartu Sant'Elena

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1939, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025