Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luciano Russo

Apostolic Nuncio to Algeria

Titular Archbishop of Monteverde

Apostolic Nuncio to Tunisia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1963 BornLusciano, Italy
1 Oct 198825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Aversa, Italy
27 Jan 201248.5AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
27 Jan 201248.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Monteverde
16 Feb 201248.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Rwanda
14 Apr 201248.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Monteverde
14 Jun 201652.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Algeria
14 Jun 201652.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Tunisia

MicroData Summary for Luciano Russo
Archbishop Luciano Russo (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Algeria

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Algeria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jan 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2012
  • c34: CB, 20 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,414
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Jun 2016