Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Sanguinetti

Bishop of Tempio-Ampurias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1945 BornLula
2 Aug 197025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Nuoro, Italy
27 Mar 199751.9AppointedBishop of Ozieri, Italy
17 May 199752.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ozieri, Italy
22 Apr 200661.0AppointedBishop of Tempio-Ampurias, Italy
10 Dec 201267.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ozieri, Italy
18 Jul 201570.3ResignedApostolic Administrator of Ozieri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Sanguinetti:
Bishop Sebastiano Sanguinetti (born ) Bishop of Tempio-Ampurias

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tempio-Ampurias.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,002
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Dec 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015