Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim Ferreira Lopes, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Viana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1949 BornSanto Tirso
25 May 197525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Nov 200152.1AppointedBishop of Dundo, Angola
3 Feb 200252.3Ordained BishopBishop of Dundo, Angola
6 Jun 200757.6AppointedBishop of Viana, Angola
29 Jul 200757.8InstalledBishop of Viana, Angola

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Ferreira Lopes:
Bishop Joaquim Ferreira Lopes O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Viana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Viana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2007
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013