Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Corrado Melis

Bishop of Ozieri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1963 BornSardara
25 Jun 198825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ales-Terralba, Italy
18 Jul 201552.3AppointedBishop of Ozieri, Italy
13 Sep 201552.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ozieri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Corrado Melis:
Bishop Corrado Melis (born ) Bishop of Ozieri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ozieri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jul 2015
  • c1: CB, 18 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: CB, 26 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,576

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015