Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bryan Joseph Bayda, C.SS.R.

Bishop of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1961 Born
31 Jul 198321.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
13 Sep 198625.0Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
26 Oct 198625.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
30 May 198725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 May 200846.6AppointedBishop of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada
27 Jun 200846.8Ordained BishopBishop of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada

MicroData Summary for Bryan Joseph Bayda
Bishop Bryan Joseph Bayda C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop of Saskatoon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaskatoon
Ordained BishopSaint George, Cathedral, Saskatoon, Eparchy of Saskatoon (Ukrainian)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saskatoon (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,766
  • prof/sole: CB, 6 Feb 2015
  • od/c1: CB, 29 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 25 Apr 2019

Quantcast