Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Kodakallil

Bishop of Satna (Syro-Malabar)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1965 BornUpputhode
31 Dec 199126.0Ordained PriestPriest of Satna (Syro-Malabar), India
22 Jul 201549.5AppointedBishop of Satna (Syro-Malabar), India
15 Sep 201549.7Ordained BishopBishop of Satna (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Kodakallil:
Bishop Joseph Kodakallil (born ) Bishop of Satna

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Satna (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 9 Sep 2015
  • c34: CB, 14 Sep 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,577

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015