Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Kollamparampil, C.M.I.

Bishop of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1958 BornCherpunkal
3 Jun 197921.1ProfessedMember of Carmelites of Mary Immaculate
6 May 198527.1Ordained PriestPriest of Carmelites of Mary Immaculate
16 Jul 201355.2AppointedBishop of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabarese), India
17 Sep 201355.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Kollamparampil:
Bishop Joseph Kollamparampil C.M.I. (born ) Bishop of Jagdalpur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2013
  • ob: CB, 2 Aug 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 18 Sep 2013