Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Ephraem Thottam

Deceased

Bishop of Marthandom (Syro-Malankara), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1928Born
14 May 195324.9Ordained PriestPriest of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India
6 Nov 198052.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India
6 Nov 198052.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Barcusus
27 Dec 198052.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barcusus
16 Dec 199668.5AppointedBishop of Marthandom (Syro-Malankara), India
9 Apr 199768.9DiedBishop of Marthandom (Syro-Malankara), India

MicroData Summary
Lawrence Ephraem Thottam
Bishop Lawrence Ephraem Thottam
(born , died )
Bishop of Marthandom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVellalampu
Ordained BishopNehru, Stadium, Kottayam, Eparchy of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar)
Death PlaceTrivandrum, Archeparchy of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara)

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,128
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,523

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025