Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John "Joy" Alappat

Auxiliary Bishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Chicago (Syro-Malabar), Illinois, USA

Titular Bishop of Bencenna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1956 Born
31 Dec 198125.2Ordained PriestPriest of Irinjalakuda (Syro-Malabar), India
24 Jul 201457.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Chicago (Syro-Malabar), Illinois, USA
24 Jul 201457.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bencenna
27 Sep 201458.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bencenna

MicroData Summary for John "Joy" Alappat
Bishop John "Joy" Alappat (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParappukara

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Chicago (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jul 2014
  • fn/c1: CB, 25 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 31 Jul 2014
  • c34: CB, 18 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,289

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast