Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Boltas, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1738BornOrán
14 Feb 178546.3AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
17 Apr 178546.5Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
8 Dec 179557.1DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Boltas
Bishop José Boltas O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Bishop of Urgell

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 102, Number 528
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 11
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 427

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 22 Feb 2016