Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Casto Royo

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Amida

Titular See: (Abbot/San Ildefonso)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1739BornEl Redal, Spain
15 Dec 178344.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amida
1 Feb 178444.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Amida
Sep 1803³64.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Amida

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Casto Royo:
Archbishop Francisco Casto Royo (born ) Titular Archbishop of Amida

  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 79
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 101, Number 521

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013