Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agustín Lezo Palomeque

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1724Born
13 Dec 177955.2AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
16 Apr 178055.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
15 Dec 178359.2AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
10 Feb 179671.4DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Agustín Lezo Palomeque
Archbishop Agustín Lezo Palomeque (born , died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCallao, Peru

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 96, Number 494
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 17
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 137, and Page 326

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast