Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anselmo Rodríguez Merino, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Almería, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1712Born
3 Oct 173018.1ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Sep 178068.0AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
30 Nov 178068.2Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
14 Jan 179885.4DiedBishop of Almería, Spain

MicroData Summary for Anselmo Rodríguez Merino
Bishop Anselmo Rodríguez Merino O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Almería

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarral

  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 78
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 97, Number 501
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,780, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast