Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Constancio Andino

Deceased

Bishop of Osma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1727BornVillarcayo
10 Dec 178154.0AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
3 Feb 178254.1Ordained BishopBishop of Albarracin, Spain
29 Mar 179062.3AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
Nov 1793³65.9DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Constancio Andino:
Bishop José Constancio Andino (born ) Bishop of Osma

  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 72, and Page 322
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 98, Number 508

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013