Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Andrés López Arroyo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1721BornCasarrubios del Monte
16 Jun 173716.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
15 Dec 178362.5AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
1 Feb 178462.6Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
14 Mar 178765.8DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Andrés López Arroyo:
Bishop Antonio Andrés López Arroyo O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 100, Number 520

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013