Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sebastián Malvar y Pinto, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1720³BornSan Martín de Salcedo, Spain
19 Oct 177756.9SelectedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
15 Dec 177757.0ConfirmedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
19 Apr 177857.4Ordained BishopBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
6 Aug 177857.7InstalledBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
15 Dec 178363.0AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
25 Sep 179574.8DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastián Malvar y Pinto:
Archbishop Sebastián Malvar y Pinto O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 94, Number 485
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 176, and Page 417

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016