Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Martínez de la Plaza

Deceased

Bishop of Cádiz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1736BornGranada
14 Feb 178548.9AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
12 Jun 178549.3Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
29 Nov 179054.7AppointedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
Oct 1800³64.6DiedBishop of Cádiz, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Martínez de la Plaza:
Bishop Antonio Martínez de la Plaza (born ) Bishop of Cádiz

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 102, Number 530

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013