Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis García Mañero

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1703BornSotillo del Rincón
19 Nov 175956.1AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
1760²56.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tortosa, Spain
26 Nov 176461.1AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
20 Jul 176763.8DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis García Mañero:
Archbishop Luis García Mañero (born , died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 7.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 78, Number 386
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 136, and Page 194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 8 Dec 2015