Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Abad y Lasierra, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Astorga

Titular Archbishop of Selymbria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1729BornEstadilla
18 Jul 178353.5AppointedBishop of Ibiza, Spain
17 Aug 178353.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ibiza, Spain
28 Sep 178757.7AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
9 Apr 179161.2ResignedBishop of Astorga, Spain
11 Apr 179262.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Selymbria
12 Jan 180676.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Abad y Lasierra:
Archbishop Manuel Abad y Lasierra O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Astorga

  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 104, and Page 242
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 374
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 100, Number 517
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016